This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 04:13:34 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $36,462.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 02/27/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 36,462 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7431

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Respondent

THIRTY-SIX THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED SIXTY-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLD CRAIG M. DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON WESTERN DISCOUNT CENTER, INC. C/U AKOP PARONYAN

3/10/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON WESTERN DISCOUNT CENTER, INC. C/U AKOP PARONYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON SAAKANUSH SAHAKYAN

3/10/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON SAAKANUSH SAHAKYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON AKOP PARONYAN

3/10/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON AKOP PARONYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON AZAT AZATYAN

3/10/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON AZAT AZATYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RETURNED RECEIPT ON AKOP PARONYAN

3/20/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RETURNED RECEIPT ON AKOP PARONYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RETURNED RECEIPT ON SAAKANUSH SAHAKYAN

3/20/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RETURNED RECEIPT ON SAAKANUSH SAHAKYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RETURNED RECEIPT ON AZAT AZATYAN

3/20/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED RETURNED RECEIPT ON AZAT AZATYAN

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/27/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/27/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

4/8/2014: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

Minute Order

4/28/2014: Minute Order

ROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON KOP PARONYAN

5/7/2014: ROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON KOP PARONYAN

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; ETC

6/25/2014: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; ETC

Minute Order

6/27/2014: Minute Order

NEW EXHIBIT9 (PROOFS OF SERVICE ON WESTERN DISCOUNT CENTER, INC. C/O AKOP PARONYAN) RE: FILED APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/8/2014: NEW EXHIBIT9 (PROOFS OF SERVICE ON WESTERN DISCOUNT CENTER, INC. C/O AKOP PARONYAN) RE: FILED APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

NEW EXHIBIT 10 (SUPPLEMENTAL EMAILED REPORT FROM DETECTIVE LEVY TAGLE(LAPD) ON STATUS OF MIKE AND JACK) RE: FILED APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/8/2014: NEW EXHIBIT 10 (SUPPLEMENTAL EMAILED REPORT FROM DETECTIVE LEVY TAGLE(LAPD) ON STATUS OF MIKE AND JACK) RE: FILED APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

9/22/2014: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

Minute Order

9/23/2014: Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2014
  • Default Judgment (OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (NEW EXHIBIT 9 PROOF OF SERVICE ON WESTERN DISCOUNT CENTER ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (NEW EXHIBIT 10 SUPPLEMENTAL EMAIL REPORT FROM DETECTIVE LEVY ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Proof of Publication Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Proof of Service (BY MAIL: ALINA AAZATYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Proof of Service (BY MAIL: AZAT AZATYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Proof of Service (BY MAIL: TIGRNUHI SAHAKYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Proof of Service (BY MAIL: AKOP PARONYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less