This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2016 at 03:09:54 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $33,230.26

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 33,230 26. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1396

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Respondent

THIRTY-THREE THOUSAND TWO HUNDRED THIRTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GOLD CRAIG M. DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

10/14/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

Unknown

10/17/2014: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/17/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MALL ON CHRISTOPHER KENDALL

10/28/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MALL ON CHRISTOPHER KENDALL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON ELIJAH P. SMITH

10/28/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON ELIJAH P. SMITH

PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON ELIJAH P. SMITH

11/7/2014: PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAIL WITH SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON ELIJAH P. SMITH

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON CHRISTOPHER KENDALL

12/5/2014: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON CHRISTOPHER KENDALL

ROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON ELIJAH P. SMITH

12/5/2014: ROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON ELIJAH P. SMITH

Minute Order

12/19/2014: Minute Order

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED CO

2/17/2015: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED CO

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

2/17/2015: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

Minute Order

2/18/2015: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2015
  • Judgment (DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Application-Miscellaneous (for default jdgmt ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON ELIJAH P. SMITH ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Proof of Service (ON CHRISTOPHER KENDALL ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Proof of Service (FIRST CLASS MAIL ON CHRISTOPHER KENDALL ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Proof of Service (FIRST CLASS ELIJAH P. SMITH ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less