This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2019 at 21:46:18 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $32,058.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 05/06/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 32,058 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8466

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Respondents

THIRTY-TWO THOUSAND FIFTY-EIGHT DOLLARS

DOLLARS THIRTY-TWO THOUSAND FIFTY-EIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

REYES ROSABELLA E.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

5/6/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/12/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

6/4/2014: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON LEONEL LOPEZ

6/17/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON LEONEL LOPEZ

PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON RICARDO CARO

6/17/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON RICARDO CARO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON RENEE M. RANGEL

6/17/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON RENEE M. RANGEL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON MARIA LOPEZ

6/17/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON MARIA LOPEZ

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/17/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON MARTHA M. MORALEZ

6/17/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON MARTHA M. MORALEZ

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

6/19/2014: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

7/7/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/7/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMANT CONFERENCE

7/16/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMANT CONFERENCE

Unknown

8/20/2014: Unknown

Minute Order

9/3/2014: Minute Order

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

9/8/2014: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

9/8/2014: STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

Minute Order

9/16/2014: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 69; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Judgment; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Stipulation; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON MARTHA M. MORALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON RICARDO CARO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL AND SIGNED DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT ON MARIA LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less