This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 01:04:57 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $26,801.00 IN US CURREN

Case Summary

On 11/24/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 26,801 00 IN US CURREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2324

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Respondent

TWENTY-SIX THOUSAND EIGHT HUNDRED ONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LACY JACKIE

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

11/24/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

Unknown

12/4/2014: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/4/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON ALAN RAUL

12/19/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON ALAN RAUL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON ALEJANDRO VILLEGAS

12/19/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON ALEJANDRO VILLEGAS

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MALL ON GUADALUPE FLORES

12/19/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MALL ON GUADALUPE FLORES

Minute Order

1/23/2015: Minute Order

MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/12/2015: MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E REYES; MEMORANDUMOF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND ORDER

3/20/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E REYES; MEMORANDUMOF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND ORDER

Minute Order

3/20/2015: Minute Order

ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2015: ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON ANTONIO MILLAN ROJAS

4/8/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND CERTIFIED MAIL ON ANTONIO MILLAN ROJAS

Minute Order

4/27/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/29/2015: Minute Order

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

5/29/2015: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED C

5/29/2015: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED C

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

5/29/2015: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED C

5/29/2015: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED C

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2015
  • Default Judgment (DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITED PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Order (ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Proof of Service (GUADALUPE FLORES ALEJANDRO VILLEGAS ALAN RAUL ) Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less