This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2015 at 23:49:13 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $25,693.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 03/13/2009 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 25,693 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRETT C. KLEIN and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9553

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRETT C. KLEIN

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant

TWENTY-FIVE THOUSAND SIX HUNDRED NINETY-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLEY RICHARD L.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

3/13/2009: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

3/26/2009: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

4/13/2009: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/8/2009: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

MINUTE ORDER

12/2/2009: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/23/2009: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE

2/23/2010: STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE

JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION

2/23/2010: JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION

Minute Order

2/23/2010: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2010
  • Stipulation (STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUT- ION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • Stipulation to Court Commissioner (FOR ALL PURPOSES SIGNED BY RICHARD DOOLEY AND JAIME ALMARAZ ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture (Claimant: Dora Bolanos ) Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less