This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2016 at 02:38:33 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $25,620.00 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 09/30/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 25,620 00 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1168

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Respondent

TWENTY-FIVE THOUSAND SIX HUNDRED TWENTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLD CRAIG M.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

9/30/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/2/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/2/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON JAMES THOMAS

10/7/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON JAMES THOMAS

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON E. THOMAS

10/7/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON E. THOMAS

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON OCTAV1O ALATORRE

10/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS U.S. MAIL AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON OCTAV1O ALATORRE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/18/2014: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

Minute Order

12/9/2014: Minute Order

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

1/27/2015: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; ETC

1/27/2015: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; ETC

Minute Order

1/28/2015: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2015
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • Default Judgment (OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Proof of Publication Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Proof of Service Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less