This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2019 at 03:54:03 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $236,457.08 IN U S CURR

Case Summary

On 01/21/2009 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 236,457 08 IN U S CURR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRETT C. KLEIN, KENJI MACHIDA, BARBARA A. MEIERS and VICTOR GREENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8679

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRETT C. KLEIN

KENJI MACHIDA

BARBARA A. MEIERS

VICTOR GREENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Claimant

BAGHOMIAN MARDIK

Defendants

TWO HUNDRED THRITY-SIX THOUSAND FOUR HUN-

HUN- TWO HUNDRED THRITY-SIX THOUSAND FOUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLEY RICHARD L.

Defendant Attorneys

GERAGOS MARK J. ESQ.

SUE BROWN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON KARINEH BAGHOMIAN

3/3/2009: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON KARINEH BAGHOMIAN

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON MARD1K BAGHOMIAN

3/3/2009: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON MARD1K BAGHOMIAN

Unknown

7/10/2009: Unknown

MINUTE ORDER

7/14/2009: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/22/2010: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMIHED AND SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SUE BROWN

6/29/2010: OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMIHED AND SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SUE BROWN

PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORETIES IN REPLY TO CLAIMANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

7/7/2010: PETITIONERS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORETIES IN REPLY TO CLAIMANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

MINUTE ORDER

7/13/2010: MINUTE ORDER

Minute Order

8/11/2010: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER; ORDER

8/11/2010: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER; ORDER

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/4/2010: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

10/4/2010: Unknown

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

10/26/2010: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

CLAIMANT BAGHOMIANS TRIAL BRIEF

10/28/2010: CLAIMANT BAGHOMIANS TRIAL BRIEF

CLAIMANTS OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

10/28/2010: CLAIMANTS OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

CLAIMANTS EXHIBIT LIST

10/28/2010: CLAIMANTS EXHIBIT LIST

STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 30, 2010 TRIAL TO FEBRUARY 16, 2011: ORDER

11/16/2010: STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 30, 2010 TRIAL TO FEBRUARY 16, 2011: ORDER

Minute Order

4/20/2011: Minute Order

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2012
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 44; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Judgment; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • Stipulation; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 12; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2009
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON KARINEH BAGHOMIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON MARD1K BAGHOMIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • Proof-Personal Service; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 66; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less