This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2016 at 03:41:06 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $198,475.00 IN U S CURR

Case Summary

On 06/12/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 198,475 00 IN U S CURR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9017

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant and Respondent

ONE HUNDRED NINETY-EIGHT THOUSAND FOUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLD CRAIG M. DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

6/12/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/17/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

6/17/2014: Unknown

Minute Order

9/11/2014: Minute Order

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

9/12/2014: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED CO

10/9/2014: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED RELIEF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND ORDER LODGED CO

DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

10/9/2014: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY

Minute Order

10/10/2014: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2014
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND FOR ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • Default Judgment (OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION OF FORFEITURE PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Proof of Publication Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less