This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2015 at 23:44:37 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $17,252.24 IN U S CURRE

Case Summary

On 03/27/2009 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 17,252 24 IN U S CURRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRETT C. KLEIN and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9856

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRETT C. KLEIN

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

A 1997 CADILLAC SEDAN

JEWELRY-GOLD/DIAMONDS (NECKLACES BRACEL-

ROBERT COLEMAN REG NO. 47330-112

SEVENTEEN THOUSAND TWO HUNDRED FIFTY-TWO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLEY RICHARD L.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

3/27/2009: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/1/2009: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

5/18/2009: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

OPPOSITION TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2033 -

6/30/2009: OPPOSITION TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2033 -

CL.AINANTS RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIRES PURSUANT TO CCP S230.

6/30/2009: CL.AINANTS RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIRES PURSUANT TO CCP S230.

RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURES SECTION 2031

6/30/2009: RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS, PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURES SECTION 2031

STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF BRUCE MITCHELL, COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE/JUDGE PRO TEM "FOR ALL PURPOSES"

12/2/2009: STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF BRUCE MITCHELL, COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE/JUDGE PRO TEM "FOR ALL PURPOSES"

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/23/2009: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

1/22/2010: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE JUNE 2, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE

6/1/2010: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE JUNE 2, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/1/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/30/2010: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL

12/2/2010: NOTICE OF TRIAL

TRIAL BRIEF

1/10/2011: TRIAL BRIEF

JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER FOR DISTRI BLJTION

1/10/2011: JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER FOR DISTRI BLJTION

Minute Order

1/10/2011: Minute Order

NOTICE OF JANUARY 10, 2011 RULING GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

1/18/2011: NOTICE OF JANUARY 10, 2011 RULING GRANTING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

1/18/2011: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2011
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • Judgment (JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • Motion (FOR ISSUE, evidence, AND/OR TEMINA TING SANCTIONS; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • Notice of Trial Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUC- TION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE JUNE 2, 2010 STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Notice (CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • Stipulation to Court Commissioner (FOR ALL PURPOSES SIGNED BY RICHARD DOOLEY ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • Response (to Demand for Production and Inspection of Documents ) Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • Opposition Document (Opposition to Request for Admission ) Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • Response (Response to Interrogatories ) Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture ( by Robert Coleman ) Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2009
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less