This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 14:08:19 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL VS CARSON DOMINGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/24/2013 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CARSON DOMINGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9114

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE OF STATE OF CA THRU DEPT OF TRANS

Defendants

CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROPERTIES LP

DOES 1 - 50 INC

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM &CSATO L.C.

LANDAMERICA TITLE CO

R&R REAL ESTATE LP

TIB THE INDEPENDENT BANKERSBANK

SOUTH BAY BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE OF CALIF LEGAL DIV -JULIE JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO L.C.

MANATT PHELPS & PHILLIPS (E. BURG)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2015
  • Order (PLNTF- PEOPLE - SUBMIT FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATI ON AND WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS - ORDER SIGNED 5-7-14 3 cert copy to can trans ATTY - DOT LEGAL DIV. JORDAN) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Satisfaction of Judgment (DEFT/ CREDITOR - CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROPERTIES LP 2-26-15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN FULL AS TO - STATE OF CALIFORNIA) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • Judgment (PLNTF- PEOPLE OF STATE OF CA STIPULATED JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • Stipulation (FOR JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Notice-Settlement (plntf - PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CA NOTICE OF SETTLMENT OF ENTIRE CASE ATTY - JORDAN) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Motion in Limine (DEFT- CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROPERTIES LP MO IN LIMINE 2 MO IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE F O 2003 PURCHASE PRICE OF THE PROPE RTY) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Motion in Limine (DEFT- CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROPERTIES LP DEFT'S MO IN LIMINE 1 TO EXCUDE REF. TO JURORS' INTEREST AS TAXPAYERS) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Notice of Ruling (ON ISSUE AFFECTING THE DETERMINATION OF COMPENSATION RE: ENTITLEMENT TO PRECONDEMNATION DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • Proof of Service (PLNTF- STATE OF CAL P.S. MO FOR RULING ON ISSUE AFFECT ING DETERMIANTION OF COMP :P&A ETC P.S EDWARD G BURG ES.Q SUB SERVED SUSAN KIM PIC. 11-6-14 DELIVERY TO LAW OFFICE) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Notice (OF INCREASE OF DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2013
  • Application - Miscellaneous (DEFT- CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROPERTIES - APPL FOR WITHDRAWAL OF DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION ATTY - MANATT PHELPS) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (LB482488009 CHECK $455 (1ST APPEAR + STIP & ORD FEE) DEFT- CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROPERTIES - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTY- MANATT PHELPS ...) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • Order (DEFT- CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROP. - ORDER FOR W/DRAWAL FROM DEPOSIT OF PROBABLE COMPENSATION - RECV'D 10-31-13 - SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS 10-31-13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • Disclaimer (PLNTF- PEOPLE - DISCLAIMER OF "TIB" THE INDEPENDENT BANKERSBANK, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO SOUTH BAY BANK,NA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other ( LETTER CORRECTING CASE NO. ( FROM NS027104 TO NC059114 ) ) Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Notice of Pending Action (PLNTF- STATE PNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF PROCEEDINGT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Summons Filed (ORIGINAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • Order ( - ORDER PURSUANT TO LA SUPERIOR CO URT RULE 2.0F REQUIRING 1-5 FWY PR OJECT EMINENT DOMAIN CASES TO BE F ILED IN SOUTH DISTRICT ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARSON DOMINGUEZ PROPERTIES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO is a litigant

Latest cases where TIB - THE INDEPENDENT BANKERSBANK is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant