This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2019 at 06:11:16 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CA VS $28,180.00 IN U S CURRENCY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2014 PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 28,180 00 IN U S CURRENCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7803

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Respondents

TWENTY-EIGHT THOUSAND ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY

EIGHTY TWENTY-EIGHT THOUSAND ONE HUNDRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

REYES ROSABELLA E. DEPUTY DIST. ATTY.

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

3/20/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/4/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/4/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

4/29/2014: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/17/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/16/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

7/16/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/4/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/10/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMITFED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES

10/2/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMITFED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS; (CCP ? 2030.290, SUBD. (B) 2030.250, 2031.250, 2031.300, SUBD.(B) AND 2023,030

10/2/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION AND INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS; (CCP ? 2030.290, SUBD. (B) 2030.250, 2031.250, 2031.300, SUBD.(B) AND 2023,030

STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

11/14/2014: STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/14/2014: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

11/14/2014: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2015
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 69; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Stipulation; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Judgment; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Motion to Compel; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Motion; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER THAT REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION BE DEEMED ADMITFED; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less