This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2019 at 07:20:57 (UTC).

PEOPLE OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS $184,358.04 IN U S CURRENCY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 PEOPLE OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 184,358 04 IN U S CURRENCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6732

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Respondents

ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY-FOUR THOUSAND THREE

THREE ONE HUNDRED EIGHTY-FOUR THOUSAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOLD CRAIG M. DEPUTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

1/14/2014: PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/17/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

1/17/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

2/18/2014: CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

2/28/2014: DECLARATION OF ROSABELLA E. REYES RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

Unknown

2/28/2014: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/28/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

3/17/2014: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

3/19/2014: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

5/14/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

5/19/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Unknown

7/3/2014: Unknown

Minute Order

7/11/2014: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

7/11/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/7/2014: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

11/7/2014: STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

Minute Order

11/10/2014: Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2015
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 69; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 69; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Status Conference (Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Judgment; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Stipulation; Filed by People of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2014
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Claim Opposing Forfeiture; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2014
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less