This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 19:02:12 (UTC).

PEGGY WEBB VS. IZIKSON LEDNIA, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2012 PEGGY WEBB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IZIKSON LEDNIA, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM BARRY and ADR NEUTRAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6694

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM BARRY

ADR NEUTRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB PEGGY

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

LEDNIA IZIKSON

TROUT TRANSPORTATION LLC

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

FIELDS GARY D.

TROUT TRANSPORTATION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIBSON & HUGHES

Defendant Attorneys

LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER

LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER &

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/21/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2013
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Statement-Agreement (Partial) (FIRST STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT FILED. MEDIATION WAS HELD ON 05/30/13 LASTED 4 HRS AND ENDED IN PARTIAL AGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (Request for mediation status ) Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Notice (of case reassignment ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (Request for status - Mediation Hearing ) Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • Notice (OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR 1/8/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2012
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT AGAINST LEONID IZIKSON ESA & SERVED AS IZIKSON LEDNIA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.