This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 10:43:41 (UTC).

PEACHES NONG JENSEN VS HENRY J JOSEFSBERG ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2016 PEACHES NONG JENSEN filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against HENRY J JOSEFSBERG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0667

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENSEN PEACHES NONG

Defendants

CHARON SOLUTIONS INC

JOSEFSBERG HENRY J

SOLUTIONS INC

SEGAL PERRY LEONARD DBA CHARON LAW

CHARON SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RENFREW YVONNE M.

Defendant Attorney

JOSEFSBERG HENRY J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

3/13/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Motion to Tax Costs

5/11/2020: Motion to Tax Costs

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2020

8/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2020

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS

12/30/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEACHES NON...)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF PEACHES NON...)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS

1/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS

Objection - PLAINTIFF'S DUE PROCESS OBJECTIONS

10/23/2017: Objection - PLAINTIFF'S DUE PROCESS OBJECTIONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/1/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO ANSWER

9/30/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO ANSWER

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF

9/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF

Reply - REPLY RE PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/18/2019: Reply - REPLY RE PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO ANSWER

10/25/2019: Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO ANSWER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLAIN...)

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY PLAIN...)

Minute Order -

1/10/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/28/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Reassignment)

11/7/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Reassignment)

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs (Filed by Plaintiff Peaches Nong Jensen;) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS; Filed by Charon Solutions, Inc (Defendant); Henry J Josefsberg (Defendant); Perry Leonard Segal (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Plaintiff Peaches Non...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to Motion to Tax Costs); Filed by Charon Solutions, Inc (Defendant); Henry J Josefsberg (Defendant); Perry Leonard Segal (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:52 AM in Department 16; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Filed by Peaches Nong Jensen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 16; Non-Jury Trial ((T/E1 Day)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Henry J Josefsberg (Defendant); Perry Leonard Segal (Defendant); Charon Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
154 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Peaches Nong Jensen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Peaches Nong Jensen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less