This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 14:49:29 (UTC).

PAULA NAZARI VS SHELAX GATEWAY HOTEL MEZZ LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2014 PAULA NAZARI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHELAX GATEWAY HOTEL MEZZ LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, DAVID SOTELO, STUART M. RICE and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7324

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

DAVID SOTELO

STUART M. RICE

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NAZARI PAULA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50

PORTFOLIO HOTELS & RESORTS LLC

SHELAX GATEWAY HOTEL MEZZ LLC

SHERATON GATEWAY LOS ANGELES

MAZAL INCORPORATED (DOE 3)

SHARON CATERING CORP.

MAZAL INCORPORATED

SHARON CATERING CORP. (DOE 2)

DOES 1-50

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

PORTFOLIO HOTELS & RESORTS LLC

SHELAX GATEWAY HOTEL MEZZ LLC

SHERATON GATEWAY LOS ANGELES

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MAZAL INCORPORATED (DOE 3)

SHARON CATERING CORP.

ARMIN ARVIN

MAZAL INCORPORATED

SHARON CATERING CORP. (DOE 2)

PORTFOLIO SHELAX LLC

ARVIN ARMIN

SHELAX GATEWAY HOTEL LLC

GOLDEN SERVICES (ROE 3)

MASIHI JANET ABEDI DBA GOLDEN SERVICE

PORTFOLIO SHELAX LLC (ROE 1)

JANET ABEDI MASIHI DBA GOLDEN SERVICES

DOES 1 TO 100

PORTFOLIIO SHELAX LLC (ROE 1)

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BENJI DANIEL

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

GREG COLLIDGE

COLLIDGE GREG

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ANNA J. MONTELEONE

BERGER MICHELLE R. ESQ.

HALAS & MUHAR

MARC H. GARBER

MONTELEONE ANNA J. ESQ.

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

OZ TANNENBAUM

TANNENBAUM OZ

BERGER MICHELLE R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MONTELEONE ANNA J. ESQ.

OMRANI SEPEHR ESQ.

SEPEHR OMRANI

 

Court Documents

Notice - OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

7/13/2018: Notice - OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT

Ex Parte Application -

7/17/2018: Ex Parte Application -

Proof of Service - No Service -

7/24/2018: Proof of Service - No Service -

Proof of Service - No Service -

7/24/2018: Proof of Service - No Service -

Opposition - TO SHARON CATERING CROP.

7/25/2018: Opposition - TO SHARON CATERING CROP.

Opposition - TO SHARON CATERING CORP.

7/26/2018: Opposition - TO SHARON CATERING CORP.

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) -

7/31/2018: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) -

Notice of Ruling -

8/1/2018: Notice of Ruling -

Notice of Ruling -

8/3/2018: Notice of Ruling -

Notice - OF MOTION

8/6/2018: Notice - OF MOTION

Opposition -

8/13/2018: Opposition -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

8/13/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

8/15/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Notice of Ruling -

8/20/2018: Notice of Ruling -

Notice of Ruling -

8/20/2018: Notice of Ruling -

Other - - CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/20/2018: Other - - CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice -

8/20/2018: Notice -

Declaration -

9/20/2018: Declaration -

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 10/16/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by PAULA NAZARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by PAULA NAZARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by PAULA NAZARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SHARON CATERING CORP. (DOE 2) (Legacy Party); MAZAL INCORPORATED (DOE 3) (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
355 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by PAULA NAZARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PAULA NAZARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHELAX GATEWAY HOTEL LLC AOS: CSC LAWYERS INCORPORATED SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where PORTFOLIO HOTELS & RESORTS LLC is a litigant