This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:01:39 (UTC).

PAUL JENNINGS VS COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPA

Case Summary

On 10/26/2016 PAUL JENNINGS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8511

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNINGS PAUL

Defendants

THORNE JOHN

TUTHILL MARY LU

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE

Cross Defendants

PENCE CHARLES

PARTNERS TRUST REAL ESTATE BROKERAGE &

NOWINSKI JEFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESLUK BRIAN S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

JONES WHITNEY D. ESQ.

THRASHER THOMAS N. JR. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

2/22/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

CROSS-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

2/22/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

2/22/2018: DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. PETERSEN IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

2/22/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

2/22/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF EACH CLAIM

DEFENDANT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE OMPANY'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

5/11/2018: DEFENDANT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE OMPANY'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/15/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

5/23/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

10/26/2016: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

10/26/2016: PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/2/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/2/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

12/22/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Paul Jennings (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Partners Trust Real Estate Brokerage & (Cross-Defendant); Charles Pence (Cross-Defendant); Jeff Nowinski (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Docketat 09:01 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Paul Jennings (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S3 & E REAL ESTATE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KESLUK BRIAN SCOTT