This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2019 at 16:19:02 (UTC).

PAUL D BOJIC VS SEE GAMES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 PAUL D BOJIC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SEE GAMES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0805

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOJIC PAUL D.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

SEE GAMES LLC

SEE VIRTUAL WORLD 2 LLC

SEE VIRTUAL WORLD MJ LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL N. BERKE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT CORPORATION BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

2/24/2015: ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT CORPORATION BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE

Minute Order

3/17/2015: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/20/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/7/2015: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/15/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/4/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

6/12/2015: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

6/12/2015: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

6/12/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT

6/19/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT

7/23/2015: JUDGMENT

CASE SUMMARY

7/23/2015: CASE SUMMARY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/23/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/23/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL N. BERKE RE: ACCRUED INTEREST

9/29/2015: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL N. BERKE RE: ACCRUED INTEREST

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

9/29/2015: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL N. BERKE RE: ACCRUED INTEREST

2/23/2016: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL N. BERKE RE: ACCRUED INTEREST

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION (MONEY JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Cost Bill After Judgment; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL N. BERKE RE: ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2015
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT CORPORATION BY DELIVERY PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE CORP. CODE SECTION 1702; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Paul D. Bojic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Paul D. Bojic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Paul D. Bojic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Paul D. Bojic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEE GAMES LLC is a litigant