This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 00:48:50 (UTC).

PATRICK KOURY VS DUNCAN C MAHONE TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 PATRICK KOURY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DUNCAN C MAHONE TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4114

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOURY PATRICK

Defendants and Respondents

DUNCAN C. MAHUE TRUST

DOES 1 TO 10

DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/16/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/16/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

12/16/2016: Unknown

DEFENDANT, DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

4/25/2017: DEFENDANT, DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

RULING RE: (1) DEMURRER; ETC

6/1/2017: RULING RE: (1) DEMURRER; ETC

Minute Order

6/1/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AT HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

6/5/2017: NOTICE OF RULING AT HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANT, DUNCAN C. MARONE TRUST'S NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; ETC.

6/20/2017: DEFENDANT, DUNCAN C. MARONE TRUST'S NOTICE OF CONTINUED MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; ETC.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

6/20/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC.

Minute Order

7/6/2017: Minute Order

RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

7/6/2017: RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF RULING AT HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/10/2017: NOTICE OF RULING AT HEARING FOR DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

8/9/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

REPLY OF DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-. OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

9/12/2017: REPLY OF DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST TO PLAINTIFF'S NON-. OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/19/2017: Minute Order

RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/19/2017: RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING AT DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MALONE TRUST'S MOTION TO DISMISS

9/22/2017: NOTICE OF RULING AT DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MALONE TRUST'S MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/30/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Duncan C. Mahone Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING AT DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MALONE TRUST'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 91; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • RULING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • RULING RE: (1) DEMURRER; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DEFENDANT, DUNCAN C. MAHONE TRUST'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Duncan C. Mahone Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Demurrer; Filed by Duncan C. Mahone Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Patrick Koury (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC644114    Hearing Date: January 24, 2020    Dept: NCD

TENTATIVE RULING

Calendar: 10

Date: 1/24/20

Case No: BC 664114 Trial Date: February 24, 2020

Case Name: The Estate of Andres Ramirez, et al. v. City of Pasadena et al.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

Moving Party: Defendant City of Pasadena

Responding Party: Plaintiff Elba Hernandez

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Order granting summary judgment in favor of the City in this case.

In the alternative, summary adjudication of issues.

CAUSES OF ACTION: from First Amended Complaint

1) Wrongful Death—Dangerous Condition of Public Property

2) Survival Action—Dangerous Condition of Public Property

3) Wrongful Death—Vicarious Liability

4) Survival Action—Vicarious Liability

5) Wrongful Death—Negligence

6) Survival Action—Negligence

SUMMARY OF FACTS:

This action was originally brought by plaintiff Andres Ramirez, a minor, through his mother and GAL Elba Hernandez, alleging that plaintiff was gravely injured in a vehicle-bicyclist collision occurring on an intersection under the control of defendant City of Pasadena.

The court has since granted leave to amend the pleading to reflect that plaintiff Ramirez has died, and his claims are now being pursued by his Estate through its personal representative, Elba Hernandez, and by Elba Hernandez individually and as successor in interest to decedent.

The FAC alleges that at the time of the accident, decedent was twelve years old, and that the City registers among the highest number of collisions involving cyclists, including many injury and fatality accidents involving minors. The pleading alleges that the subject intersection was a dangerous condition of public property, including due to the intersection having inadequate timing on traffic control devices, and/or unsafe mechanical maintenance of the devices, and inadequate marking and delineation of lanes, crosswalks, and other features of the subject intersection.

Defendant City has filed a cross-complaint for indemnity, declaratory relief and contribution against cross-defendant Jacquelyn Licea, the owner and operator of the vehicle involved in the subject collision. Licea has filed a cross-complaint for indemnity against the City.

RULING:

Defendant City of Pasadena’s Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication is CONTINUED to EITHER March 6, 2020 or March 13, 2020, if available due to court calendar congestion, or alternate dates selected in consultation with counsel.

Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference.

Trial Setting.