This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 03:50:23 (UTC).

PATRICK KEALY VS SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2010 PATRICK KEALY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ABRAHAM KHAN and ALAN S. ROSENFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7113

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ABRAHAM KHAN

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KEALY PATRICK

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-50

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendant

PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

HOLTZMAN ROBERT A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HUA NICHOLAS T.

GALLAI GLACOMO

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SELMAN BREITMAN

Cross Defendant Attorney

MANDELL BARBARA J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MARCH 21, 2011 POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

3/22/2011: NOTICE OF RULING RE: MARCH 21, 2011 POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/19/2011: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PATRICK KEALYS CROSS- COMPLAINT AGAINST PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF 2. BREACH OF CONTRACT 3. BREACH OF THE COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING I BAD FAITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRI

8/2/2011: PATRICK KEALYS CROSS- COMPLAINT AGAINST PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF 2. BREACH OF CONTRACT 3. BREACH OF THE COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING I BAD FAITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRI

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/29/2011: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE TO SUMMONS AND CROSSCOMPLAINT OF PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY AGAINST SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

9/1/2011: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE TO SUMMONS AND CROSSCOMPLAINT OF PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY AGAINST SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF RULING RE: SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/6/2011: NOTICE OF RULING RE: SEPTEMBER 29, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF CRAIG H. BELL (AND EXHIBITS 1 & 2) IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCOTTSDALES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF KEALY, ETC

10/19/2011: DECLARATION OF CRAIG H. BELL (AND EXHIBITS 1 & 2) IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCOTTSDALES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF KEALY, ETC

PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY?S OPPOSITION TO SCOTTSI)ALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDCMENT

12/30/2011: PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY?S OPPOSITION TO SCOTTSI)ALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDCMENT

PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PORTION OF SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TN REPLY RE: DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S PERSON MOST QUA

1/9/2012: PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PORTION OF SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TN REPLY RE: DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S PERSON MOST QUA

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/14/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/14/2012: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/16/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF INITIAL JURY FEES - CCP SECTION 631

3/16/2012: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF INITIAL JURY FEES - CCP SECTION 631

DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HERRINGTON IN SUPPORT OF SCOTTSDALE?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION AND NET WORTH INCLUDING COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF SCOTTSDALE

3/27/2012: DECLARATION OF KATHERINE HERRINGTON IN SUPPORT OF SCOTTSDALE?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION AND NET WORTH INCLUDING COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF SCOTTSDALE

DEFENDANT SCOTTSDALE?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS, DOCUMENTS, AND OTHER THINGS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF KEALY IN SUPPORT OF I-US MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION

3/27/2012: DEFENDANT SCOTTSDALE?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS, DOCUMENTS, AND OTHER THINGS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF KEALY IN SUPPORT OF I-US MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO 1WF1?%I)ANT SCOVTSDAIJ INSURANCE COMPANY?S F.VLDETIARY OB.WCTIONS TO F?II)ENCE IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCO VFRY OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION

4/2/2012: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO 1WF1?%I)ANT SCOVTSDAIJ INSURANCE COMPANY?S F.VLDETIARY OB.WCTIONS TO F?II)ENCE IN SUPPORT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCO VFRY OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION IN LJMINE NO. 12- RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF SPECULATIVE DAMAGES

4/12/2012: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY?S MOTION IN LJMINE NO. 12- RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF SPECULATIVE DAMAGES

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (re jury fees) - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • Docketin Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Docketat 10:30 am in Department 31, Alan S. Rosenfield, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (FROM DEPARTMENT 51) - Case Deemed Settled at Settle Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference - Transferred to different departmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DocketReply/Response (TO OPP TO MTN TO COMPEL ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Motion to Compel - Submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • DocketOpposition Document (TO MTN TO TRIFURCATE ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2010
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (***********************NO FUTURE DATE SET*****************C.F. 9/27/10 BY STIP/ORDER***************************) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Docketat 08:45 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Hearing prev advanced & vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 51, Abraham Khan, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONT. POST MEDIATION S.C. FROM 9/27/10 TO 12/6/10 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketNotice (UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

BARBARA J. MANDELL (State Bar No. 106523) TERESA M. WAINMAN (State Bar No. 143825) MANDELL & ASSOCIATES, PC

20750 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 450

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Telephone: (818) 564-4023

Facsimile: (818) 337-7256

Attorneys for Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant,

PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY

lEvllLiliil) ORNIA SUPEC%S&T(‘QggIOS ANGELES

JAN 062012

John Ac:Clarke, Exeguuve uincer/Clerk BY . Deputy ena Juliano

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES-CENTRAL DISTRICT

PATRICK KEALY, an individual

Plaintiff, V.

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY, A | Delaware corporation AND DOES 1 through 50, Defendants.

AND ALL RELATED CROSS-COMPLAINTS.

N’ N’ e N N’ N N’

Case No.: BC 437113

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS AGAINST SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY’S CROSS- COMPLAINT

Compilaint Filed: May 4, 2010 Cross-Complaint Filed: May 13, 2011

Date: March 23,2012 Time: 9:00 a.m.

Dept.: 51

Judge: Hon. Abraham Kahn

[Filed Concurrently with Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Declaration of Barbara J. Mandell; Request for Judicial Notice]

Trial: April 24, 2012