This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 14:43:56 (UTC).

PATRICIA JOHNSON VS THE KROGER CO

Case Summary

On 06/27/2013 PATRICIA JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0942

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOHNSON PATRICIA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

EMPIRE DEMOLITION INC.

FP CONTRACTING INC. (DOE 1)

KROGER CO. THE

RALPHS

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

FP CONTRACTING INC. DOE 1

LAW OFFICES OF JAMIE SKEBBA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

RALPHS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LUTY ROBERT L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

D'ORO FRANK J. ESQ.

HAHN BISTLINE & ASSOCIATES

PORTER THOMAS W. ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LABAT KAREN M. ESQ.

Cross Defendant Attorney

OFFENHAUSER TYLER D. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

CARL J. BASILE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/2/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

10/14/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

SUMMONS -

10/28/2014: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

11/5/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

DEFENDANT FP CONTRACTING, INC.'S AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 2)

12/9/2014: DEFENDANT FP CONTRACTING, INC.'S AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 2)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/22/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND POSTING OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 631

2/4/2015: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL AND POSTING OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 631

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/24/2015: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/24/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESSES AND INFORMATION [CCP ? 2034]

5/11/2015: DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESSES AND INFORMATION [CCP ? 2034]

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED DATES ORDER THEREON

5/28/2015: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED DATES ORDER THEREON

CO-DEFENDANT RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPHS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S NON-RETAINED MEDICAL EXPERT WITNESSES TO INFORMATION AND OPINIONS DEVELOPED IN THE COUR

10/8/2015: CO-DEFENDANT RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPHS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S NON-RETAINED MEDICAL EXPERT WITNESSES TO INFORMATION AND OPINIONS DEVELOPED IN THE COUR

EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC.?S JOINDER TO RALPHS GROCERY COMI?ANY?S MOTION IN L1MINE NO. ONE

10/14/2015: EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC.?S JOINDER TO RALPHS GROCERY COMI?ANY?S MOTION IN L1MINE NO. ONE

CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANT EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO CO-DEFENDANT RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ALL MEDICAL

10/22/2015: CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANT EMPIRE DEMOLITION, INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO CO-DEFENDANT RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPH'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE ALL MEDICAL

[PROPOSED] SHORT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

10/30/2015: [PROPOSED] SHORT STATEMENT OF THE CASE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/7/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1/6/2016: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/5/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Empire Demolition, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Law Offices of Jamie Skebba (Cross-Complainant); American Guard Services, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Patricia Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS ILNCORRECT NAME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Patricia Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketANSWER OF RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPHS TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY [PREMISES LIABILITY]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Patricia Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FP CONTRACTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPIRE DEMOLITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant