This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2016 at 21:51:50 (UTC).

PATRICIA GORDON VS MAY LING YU ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/01/2014 PATRICIA GORDON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAY LING YU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ERNEST HIROSHIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9335

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ERNEST HIROSHIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORDON PATRICIA

Defendants and Respondents

CONCORD REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.

COSMOPOLITAN ON HORN

DOES 1 TO 50

HORN ACQUISITION LLC

ROBIN INVESTMENT GROUP INC. THE

ROBIN RUBEN S.

YU MAY LING

THE ROBIN INVESTMENT GROUP INC.

MLT XV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID H. PIERCE & ASSOCIATES PC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

EARLY MASLACH & SEPE

DANIELS FINE ISRAEL ET AL. LLP

GORDON & REES LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/26/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

4/9/2015: Unknown

Minute Order

4/20/2015: Minute Order

Unknown

5/13/2015: Unknown

Minute Order

5/28/2015: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE RE SERVICE OF PROCESS; ETC.

6/11/2015: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE RE SERVICE OF PROCESS; ETC.

Minute Order

6/16/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON JUNE 16, 2015

6/22/2015: NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON JUNE 16, 2015

Unknown

9/21/2015: Unknown

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HORN ACQUISITION, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CONCORD REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, THE ROBIN INV

4/12/2016: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HORN ACQUISITION, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CONCORD REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, THE ROBIN INV

Minute Order

4/12/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/5/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HORN ACQUISITION, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CONCORD REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND THE ROBIN

8/18/2016: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HORN ACQUISITION, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, CONCORD REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND THE ROBIN

STIPULATION TO VACATE AND CONTINUE TRIAL, MEDIATION COMPLETON DATE, AND ALL RELATED DATES

8/18/2016: STIPULATION TO VACATE AND CONTINUE TRIAL, MEDIATION COMPLETON DATE, AND ALL RELATED DATES

Minute Order

8/18/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/19/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

5/1/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Minute Order

6/22/2017: Minute Order

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2015
  • Notice (of association of counsel ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Request to Enter Default (REJECT FOR YU- #28 FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Request (REQUEST FOR REFUND APPROVED DUPLICATE FIRST PAPER FEE CCH280197099 5/13/15 $1305 REFUND #R63539 ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Notice (OF ERRATA RE CMC STATEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Association of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Declaration (of Due Diligence RE Service of Process ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Declaration of Diligence Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (RE CMC/OSC May 28, 2015 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robin Investment Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONCORD REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC. is a litigant