This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 15:17:15 (UTC).

PATRICIA BETHUNE VS KENNETH BUCALO

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 PATRICIA BETHUNE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KENNETH BUCALO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RALPH C. HOFER and JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3730

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RALPH C. HOFER

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BETHUNE PATRICIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BUCALO KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

SIMON DAWN T. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GLUCK STEVEN M.

GLUCK STEVEN MARTIN

Other Attorneys

SIMON DAWN T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2015: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/18/2015: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/2/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/16/2015: Minute Order

Legacy Document

1/22/2016: Legacy Document

Minute Order

9/13/2016: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

7/13/2017: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

7/24/2017: Minute Order

Legacy Document

9/21/2017: Legacy Document

Motion to Consolidate

10/3/2017: Motion to Consolidate

Legacy Document

10/31/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/2/2018: Legacy Document

Notice of Ruling

1/22/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

9/24/2018: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Minute Order

1/17/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/22/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/24/2019: Minute Order

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; 2) Final Status Conference;...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference (2) OSC Re Mandatory Settlement Conference; 3) Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference (2) OSC Re Mandatory Settlement Conference; 3) Trial Setting Conference) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference 2) OSC Re Mandatory Settlement Confer...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Continuance Re MSC and Trial Setting Conference); Filed by KENNETH BUCALO (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2015
  • Answer; Filed by KENNETH BUCALO (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Notice (Notice of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC063730    Hearing Date: January 31, 2020    Dept: NCD

TENTATIVE RULING

Calendar: 10

Date: 1/31/20

Case No. EC 063730 Trial Date: None Set

Case Name: Bethune v. Bucalo, et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

[CCP §284, CRC 3.1362]

Moving Party: Law Offices of Dawn T. Simon

Name of Client: Plaintiff Patricia Bethune (No Opposition)

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Order permitting attorney to be relieved as attorney of record in this action

GROUNDS FOR MOTION:

Communication problems, refusal to cooperate in prosecution of case. Clinet refused to voluntarily execute substitution of attorney.

DECLARATION BY MOVING ATTORNEY [CRC 3.1362 (c),(d)]:

Reasons why motion is necessary: ok

Address recently confirmed (within last 30 days)

By email communication

PROPOSED ORDER (CRC 3.1362 (e)):

Address and phone number of client set forth: No

Proper warning: Ok

Future dates filled in: Outdated

ANALYSIS:

The paperwork is in order, except counsel has failed to provide on the order the various other hearings scheduled this date and has failed to provide the client’s current address and telephone number, or to check box 5 (a). If the court sets future hearings at the hearing this date, counsel should be instructed to complete paragraphs 7, 8 and 9 of the order accordingly before it is served on the client.

RULING:

[No Opposition]

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED. Counsel is ordered to complete the Order to reflect information concerning the next scheduled hearing date and other dates in this matter at paragraphs 7-9, as applicable. Counsel is also ordered to check box 5 (a) and to provide at paragraph 6 the clients current address and telephone number.

Once the Order is complete, the court will sign the Order and counsel will be relieved effective upon the efiling of the proof of service of the signed order upon the client.