This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2016 at 19:43:34 (UTC).

PASCAL ALAIN BRUANT VS TENESHA KAMEL CHATMAN

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 PASCAL ALAIN BRUANT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TENESHA KAMEL CHATMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1735

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRUANT PASCAL ALAIN

Respondent

CHATMAN TENESAH KAMEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2009
  • Declaration-Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • Declaration-Diligence Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com (date of mailing 2/24/09 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.