This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2016 at 18:34:31 (UTC).

PARVIZ EBRAHMIZADEH VS. SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS,INC. ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2013 PARVIZ EBRAHMIZADEH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1477

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EBRAHAMS TONY

EBRAHMIZADEH PARVIZ

ABRAHAM TONY

Defendants

AMIDNAMIN MANOOCHER

AMIDNAMIN MARZIEH

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS INC.

AMIDI SOHEILA

AMIDI MIKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMAB FIROUZEH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE - AS TO COMPLAIN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketDeclaration ( supp decl of firouzeh simab ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (decl of firouzeh simab ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketDeclaration (OF FIROUZEH SIMAB RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less