This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 00:07:40 (UTC).

PAPADOPOULOS, GEORGE MICHAEL VS. TSVETANOVA, GABRIELA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2016 PAPADOPOULOS, GEORGE MICHAEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TSVETANOVA, GABRIELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GELFOUND, DAVID B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3036

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GELFOUND, DAVID B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAPADOPOULOS GEORGE MICHAEL

Respondent

TSVETANOVA GABRIELA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-08 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-08 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-08 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-20-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • at 8:30 AM in Chatsworth Dept. - F39, Gelfound, David B., Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 11-10-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Order - Publication (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George - Signed on 2016-09-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Application - Publication/Posting of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George - Granted on 2016-07-19 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Notice (CASE ASSIGNEMENT TO F48, COMMR SHORT - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Papadopoulos, George ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less