This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 07:32:29 (UTC).

PAMELA LUISA CHAMORRO VS GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CAL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2014 PAMELA LUISA CHAMORRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2195

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMORRO PAMELA LUISA

Defendants

BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFOR-

PROPERTY 14760 VENTURA BLVD. SHERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRED HANASSAB

Defendant Attorney

LEE TED M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

1/3/2014: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

1/3/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/24/2014: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/18/2014: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. FOR: 1. INDEMNITY; 2. CONTRIBUTION; AND 3. APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

8/18/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. FOR: 1. INDEMNITY; 2. CONTRIBUTION; AND 3. APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/18/2014: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER BY GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ?GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA?) TO COMPLAINT

8/18/2014: ANSWER BY GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ?GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA?) TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET NO. TWO; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM O

10/29/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET NO. TWO; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM O

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRO VTDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITI

10/29/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRO VTDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITI

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM O

10/29/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM O

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED IN REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF CHARLES

10/29/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED IN REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF CHARLES

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

10/29/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; REQUEST FOR $900.00 IN MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

1/9/2015: NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

1/15/2015: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Minute Order -

1/15/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATJON OF ORDER ENTERED ON JANUARY 15, 2015, DEEMING THE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AS ADMITTED; ETC

1/27/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATJON OF ORDER ENTERED ON JANUARY 15, 2015, DEEMING THE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AS ADMITTED; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER OF CONTEMPT SANCTIONS FOR FAILING TO OBEY A COURT ORDER; REQUEST FOR A WRIT OF EXECUTION; ETC

3/4/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER OF CONTEMPT SANCTIONS FOR FAILING TO OBEY A COURT ORDER; REQUEST FOR A WRIT OF EXECUTION; ETC

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

3/7/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 92; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; (Trial; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketANSWER BY GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA) TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. FOR: 1. INDEMNITY; 2. CONTRIBUTION; AND 3. APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant); Property 14760 Ventura Blvd., Sherman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Goodwill Industries of Southern Califor- (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pamela Luisa Chamorro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

THE LEE LAW GROUP, PC 17310 Red Hill Avenue, Suite 350

Irvine, California 92614 (949) 271-9333 Telephone

CORT T

(949) 271-9334 Facsimile

O 0 3 O W»v s~ LN

o 0 FILED

Superior Court of Californ; alif County of Los Angelce)rsma

Ted M. Lee, Esq. (Bar No.: 162161) MAR 11 2015 Charles F. Nikolenko, Esq. (Bar No.: 288619) Sher THE LEE LAW GROUP, PC eI hanes, Exenpive OfficerClerk 17310 Red Hill Avenue, Suite 350 BV%_L Deputy Irvine, California 92614 ‘ctor Sino-Cruz (949) 271-9333 Telephone (949) 271-9334 Facsimile | Attorneys for Defendant/Cross-Complainant GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES; CENTRAL DISTRICT

CASE NO.: BC532195 Judge: Hon. Elia Weinbach Dept: 92

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS

PAMELA LUISA CHAMORRO, % ) % vs. ) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ) RN

Plaintiff,

SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHE PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT

CALIFORNIA; PROPERTY 14760 VENTURA BLVD. SHERMAN OAKS, CA 91403; BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES; and DOES 1-50, inclusive,

Date: February 2, 2016 Time: 1:30 p.m. Dept: 92

) ) ) ) ) % Complaint filed: 1/3/14 ) ) ) ) )

Trial Date: 7/6/15 Defendants. ’

AND ALL RELATED CROSS-ACTIONS. )

TO THE COURT, ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD HEREIN:

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Defendant/Cross-Complainant GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. (“DEFENDANT”) has lodged the following documents in support of its Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Motion for Summary Judgment against Plaintiff PAMELA LUISA CHAMORRO’s Complaint.

1. Exhibit “A,” in support of Moving Defendant’s Motion for Summary Judgment against PAMELA LUISA CHAMORRO (“PLAINTIFF”) which is a true and

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRY MASON ENTERPRISES LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE TED M. ESQ.