This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:40:46 (UTC).

PAMELA COOK VS. JOSE LUIS MEJIA GALLEGOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2012 PAMELA COOK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE LUIS MEJIA GALLEGOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, ADR NEUTRAL and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6424

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

ADR NEUTRAL

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOK PAMELA

Defendants

MEJIA GALLEGOS JOSE LUIS

NEMAN LOGISTICS INC.

NEWMAN LOGISTICS INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

ALBERT DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOM BILL LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/18/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

4/23/2013: NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/3/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/16/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

9/12/2013: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2013
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • Notice (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (Request for SANA ) Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Notice-Mediation Hrg Date Filed by Mediator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (Request for mediation hearing ) Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CMC/OSC REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE ON CORPORATE DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2012
  • Amendment to Complaint (DOE 1 - NEWMAN LOGISTICS, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CMC/OSC REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE ON CORPORATE DEFENDANT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.