This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 19:51:35 (UTC).

PACKIT LLC VS JEANNETTE MICHELS ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2013 PACKIT LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEANNETTE MICHELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and ABRAHAM KHAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4852

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

ABRAHAM KHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PACKIT LLC

Defendants and Respondents

ICENTIAL LLC

MICHELS JEANNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROSEN & SABA LLP

GAROFALO ELLYN S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service -

7/15/2013: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF DEREK J. SARAFA FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

7/15/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF DEREK J. SARAFA FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES R. ROSEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/26/2013: DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES R. ROSEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Proof of Service -

9/23/2013: Proof of Service -

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MOTION THEREOF TO STRIKE. ETC

10/8/2013: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MOTION THEREOF TO STRIKE. ETC

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

10/8/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE (C.R.C. 3.670)

12/3/2013: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE (C.R.C. 3.670)

NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/10/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

2/4/2014: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF LAURA L. CABLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL LLC?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO HAVAS EDGE

4/22/2014: DECLARATION OF LAURA L. CABLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL LLC?S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO HAVAS EDGE

DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE; ETC

5/1/2014: DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE; ETC

STIPULATION RE ALLOWING REPLACEMENT OF FILED DOCUMENT

5/12/2014: STIPULATION RE ALLOWING REPLACEMENT OF FILED DOCUMENT

DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICRELS? `AND ICENTIAL LLC?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES; DECLARATION OF JAMES R. ROSEN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/12/2014: DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICRELS? `AND ICENTIAL LLC?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION COMPELLING DISCOVERY RESPONSES; DECLARATION OF JAMES R. ROSEN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PLAINTIFF?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

5/16/2014: PLAINTIFF?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO HAVAS EDGE

6/30/2014: DEFENDANTS JEANNETTE MICHELS? AND ICENTIAL, LLC?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF?S SUBPOENA TO HAVAS EDGE

Minute Order -

7/8/2014: Minute Order -

OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION FOR CASE NO. 15K02226 (PENDING IN DEPT. 77)

3/23/2015: OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION FOR CASE NO. 15K02226 (PENDING IN DEPT. 77)

RULING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

4/1/2015: RULING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; (OSC RE Dismissal; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; (Order ReRelated Cases; Denied) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketRULING: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketOpposition Document; Filed by Packit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION FOR CASE NO. 15K02226 (PENDING IN DEPT. 77)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jeannette Michels (Defendant); Icential, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Packit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Packit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Packit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF DEREK J. SARAFA FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Packit, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF BASED ON: (I) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less