This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 21:39:38 (UTC).

PACKIT, LLC VS JEANNETTE MICHELS

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 PACKIT, LLC filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against JEANNETTE MICHELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3565

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PACKIT LLC

Defendant and Respondent

MICHELS JEANNETTE

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT-LIMITED JURIS.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LINER LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/3/2015: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION

9/3/2015: OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

9/3/2015: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

9/3/2015: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

Proof of Service

9/29/2015: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF SCOTT M. AHMAD FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

9/29/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF SCOTT M. AHMAD FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON JEANNETTE MICHELS' DEMURRER AND ETC.

10/2/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON JEANNETTE MICHELS' DEMURRER AND ETC.

OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF PACKIT LLC; DECLARATION OF AMIR KALTGRAD

10/14/2015: OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF PACKIT LLC; DECLARATION OF AMIR KALTGRAD

Minute Order

10/14/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/29/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARLNG AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF SCOTT M. AHMAD FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

11/13/2015: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARLNG AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF SCOTT M. AHMAD FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

12/2/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

12/8/2015: Minute Order

PACKIT, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF RECORDS UNDER SEAL

12/9/2015: PACKIT, LLC'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF RECORDS UNDER SEAL

ORDER

1/27/2016: ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/28/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

2/19/2016: RESPONDENT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

PLAINTIFF PACKIT, LLC'S NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

2/23/2016: PLAINTIFF PACKIT, LLC'S NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; Status Conference (Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • REMITTITUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by PACKIT, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; Status Conference (Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF FEES DUE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (CIVIL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45; Status Conference (Status Conference; Court makes order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
113 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2015
  • DEFENDANT JEANNETTE MICHELS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT JEANNETTE MICHELS TO PLAINTIFF PACKIT, LLCS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND ATHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF DEREK J. SARAFA FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AS COUNSEL FOR PACKIT, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DEFENDANT JEANNETTE MICHELS NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; REQUEST FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES; DECLARATION OF ELLYN S. GAROFALO, ESQ. AND EXHIBITS THERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF BASED ON BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less