This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 11:11:02 (UTC).

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK VS PACIFIC SYSTEMS, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 06/08/2015 PACIFIC WESTERN BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PACIFIC SYSTEMS, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, NANCY L. NEWMAN, RICHARD A. STONE and MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4296

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

RICHARD A. STONE

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK

Defendants

PACIFIC SYSTEMS

THOMPSON JOHN

WELLS WILLIAM G.

PACIFIC SYSTEMS A NEVADA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IVANJACK LARRY G.

IVANJACK LARRY GEORGE

Defendant Attorneys

TROY & GOULD

TANGALAKIS PHILLIP L.

DAVIS WRIGHT & TREMAINE

TANGALAKIS PHILLIP LOUIS

HARPER JACOB MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown

6/15/2018: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

12/12/2016: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

1/30/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/23/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

10/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/18/2017: Unknown

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/7/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

5/1/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

2/16/2016: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

8/9/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

10/2/2015: Unknown

Case Management Statement

4/19/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

10/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/10/2016: Unknown

Unknown

7/30/2015: Unknown

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by Larry George Ivanjack (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Request (name extension) (For Removal From Service List); Filed by Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Notice (name extension) (of case reassignment to Dept M); Filed by Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Declaration (name extension) (Of Nicole S. Phillis in Support of Robert Thompson's Motion to Enforce Subpoena (Vol. 1 of 2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Declaration (name extension) (Of Nicole S. Phillis in Support of Robert Thompson's Motion to Enforce Subpoena (Vol. 2 of 2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Motion re: (name extension) (Enforce Subpoena); Filed by John Thompson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Separate Statement (In Support of John Thompson's Motion to Enforce Subpoena); Filed by John Thompson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Notice-Related Cases (RELATED CASE NUMBER SC124283 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Pacific Western Bank (Plaintiff); Pacific Systems, A Nevada Corporation (Defendant); John Thompson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.