This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 14:17:53 (UTC).

PACIFIC SYSTEMS VS WILLIAM G. WELLS

Case Summary

On 06/05/2015 PACIFIC SYSTEMS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM G WELLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY L. NEWMAN, CRAIG D. KARLAN and MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4283

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NANCY L. NEWMAN

CRAIG D. KARLAN

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC SYSTEMS

Defendants

WELLS WILLIAM G.

PACIFIC WESTERN BANK

WELLS W.G.

Cross Defendants

KRAMER JEFFERY W.

THOMPSOB ROBERT

THOMPSON JOHN

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TROY & GOULD

HARPER JACOB

TANGALAKIS PHILLIP L.

HARPER JACOB MICHAEL

TANGALAKIS PHILLIP LOUIS

Defendant Attorneys

IVANJACK LARRY G.

GILBERT RODRIGUEZ

IVANJACK LARRY GEORGE

RODRIGUEZ GILBERT

 

Court Documents

Unknown

10/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/26/2018: Unknown

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/28/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/31/2017: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Unknown

12/6/2016: Unknown

Unknown

10/2/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

5/16/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

10/2/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/6/2016: Unknown

Other -

12/27/2016: Other -

Minute Order

9/27/2017: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/1/2016: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling

2/2/2017: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

7/25/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/8/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

6/15/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/8/2016: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Cynthia Lamb CSR# 8349); Filed by Pacific Systems (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Notice (name extension) (of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Pacific Systems (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
665 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Pacific Systems (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Order (RE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST WM WELLS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Declaration (OF JACOB HARPER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Declaration (OF PAUL SEELEY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Declaration (OF JOHN THOMPSON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.