This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2020 at 16:47:26 (UTC).

PACIFIC CITY BANK VS JGP INVESTMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2010 PACIFIC CITY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JGP INVESTMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ALAN S. ROSENFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0603

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC CITY BANK

Defendants

22 WILSHIRE CENTER INVESTMENT INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

JGP INVESTMENT INC

LEE SOO HYONG

LEE SOOBYUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AN TROY S. & ASSOCIATES LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketRequest; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketAMENDED DECLARATION OF HENRY KIM IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • DocketDECLARATION OF HINRY KIM IN SUPPORI OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUMMONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pacific City Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JGP INVESTMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where 22 WILSHIRE CENTER INVESTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC CITY BANK is a litigant