This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2015 at 23:17:20 (UTC).

PACIFIC BELL DIRECTORY VS VOLTMASTERS ELECTRIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 PACIFIC BELL DIRECTORY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VOLTMASTERS ELECTRIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RALPH W. DAU, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6871

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RALPH W. DAU

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC BELL DIRECTORY

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

GASPARIAN SOURIK

SLDRYAN MIGRAN

VOLTMASTERS ELECTRIC INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGS STEPHEN J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

JOHN M. LEVANT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING

2/7/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

JUDGMENT

3/11/2011: JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

3/11/2011: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Unknown

3/26/2014: Unknown

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS ACTION, AND ORDER THEREON

9/29/2014: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS ACTION, AND ORDER THEREON

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

1/8/2009: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF CHAN(E OF AIURFSS

3/26/2014: NOTICE OF CHAN(E OF AIURFSS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 473(D) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATIONS OF SOURIK GASPARIAN, AND MIGRAN SIDRYAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

3/26/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 473(D) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATIONS OF SOURIK GASPARIAN, AND MIGRAN SIDRYAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Minute Order

3/11/2011: Minute Order

SUMMONS

8/22/2008: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION UNDER CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 583.250 DECLARATION OF JOHN M. LEVANT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

3/26/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION UNDER CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 583.250 DECLARATION OF JOHN M. LEVANT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/10/2008: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE SUMMARY

3/11/2011: CASE SUMMARY

Minute Order

3/27/2014: Minute Order

EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION PROPOSED ORDER DECLARATION OF JOHN M. LEVANT AND MIGRAN SIDRYAN UI SUPPORT OF MOTION

2/19/2014: EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION PROPOSED ORDER DECLARATION OF JOHN M. LEVANT AND MIGRAN SIDRYAN UI SUPPORT OF MOTION

EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION PORPOSED ORDER DECLARATION OF JOHN M. LEVANT AND MIGRAN SLDRYAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

1/31/2014: EX PARTE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING MOTION PORPOSED ORDER DECLARATION OF JOHN M. LEVANT AND MIGRAN SLDRYAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/16/2008: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

1/8/2009: Minute Order

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS ACTION AND ORDER THEREON ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Notice of Motion (MOT/VACATE JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Notice of Motion (DISMISS ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Notice-Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE STIPULATED JUDGMENT ) Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application ( for shortening time ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2011
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • Declaration (OF STEPHEN J. RIGGS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CASE SUMMARY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Req Ent of Def Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.