This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 13:32:17 (UTC).

OVSANNA TAKVORYAN ET AL VS TEPPER & TAKVORYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2016 OVSANNA TAKVORYAN filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against TEPPER TAKVORYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4045

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAKVORYAN KRISTINE THEODESIA

TAKVORYAN OVSANNA

Defendants

TEPPER FOSTER

TEPPER & TAKVORYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAKVORYAN OVSANNA ESQ.

REYNOLDS JAMES LEE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/10/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS' REPORT ON ARBITRATION IN THIS ACTION

6/7/2018: PLAINTIFFS' REPORT ON ARBITRATION IN THIS ACTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/7/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

Minute Order

6/22/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF COURT RULING

6/26/2018: NOTICE OF COURT RULING

Minute Order

1/4/2019: Minute Order

Notice

1/28/2019: Notice

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR THE CAUSES OF ACTION: 1. INVOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF A CORPORATION, TO WIT, TEPPER & TAKVORYAN; ETC.

6/16/2016: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR THE CAUSES OF ACTION: 1. INVOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF A CORPORATION, TO WIT, TEPPER & TAKVORYAN; ETC.

SUMMONS

6/16/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/24/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

6/24/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/11/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/11/2016: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/11/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

JOINDER IN PETITION OF DEFENDANT FOSTER TEPPER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [C.C.P. 1281.21

7/20/2016: JOINDER IN PETITION OF DEFENDANT FOSTER TEPPER TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [C.C.P. 1281.21

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

7/21/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [CCP 1281.2]; DECLARATION OF FOSTER TEPPER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

7/21/2016: PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [CCP 1281.2]; DECLARATION OF FOSTER TEPPER IN SUPPORT THEREOF

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Court Ruling); Filed by Ovsanna Takvoryan (Plaintiff); Kristine Theodesia Takvoryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT RULING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ovsanna Takvoryan (Plaintiff); Kristine Theodesia Takvoryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12; Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by Ovsanna Takvoryan (Plaintiff); Kristine Theodesia Takvoryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Ovsanna Takvoryan (Plaintiff); Kristine Theodesia Takvoryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ovsanna Takvoryan (Plaintiff); Kristine Theodesia Takvoryan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR THE CAUSES OF ACTION: 1. INVOLUNTARY DISSOLUTION OF A CORPORATION, TO WIT, TEPPER & TAKVORYAN; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEPPER & TAKVORYAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAKVORYAN OVSANNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS JAMES LEE ESQ.