This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2016 at 00:42:26 (UTC).

OTILLA CRUZ VS. DARLING TON CHILAKA NJOKU

Case Summary

On 12/27/2012 OTILLA CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DARLING TON CHILAKA NJOKU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8394

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VARGAS ARACELY (A MINOR)

VARGAS DULCE CLARYTO (A MINOR)

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

KENECHUKWU OKAFOR - DOE 1

NJOKU DARLINGTON CHILAKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SERGIO F. BENEDETTO

Defendant Attorney

REISINGER ROBERT L.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

5/21/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Unknown

5/21/2013: Unknown

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/31/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

6/5/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC?S UNOPPOSED EXPARTE APPLICATION .IUR LEAVT 10 FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORNADUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. HEATON; EPRO

7/5/2013: DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC?S UNOPPOSED EXPARTE APPLICATION .IUR LEAVT 10 FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORNADUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. HEATON; EPRO

Minute Order

7/5/2013: Minute Order

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/17/2013: AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER

7/17/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/16/2013: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPT. 91)

11/15/2013: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPT. 91)

DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. KEATON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/16/2014: DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. KEATON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/16/2014: DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.

1/16/2014: DEFENDANT HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.

DEFENDANT?S SEPARATELY-BOUND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/16/2014: DEFENDANT?S SEPARATELY-BOUND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/19/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

4/1/2014: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/25/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (W/OUT PREJ, ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (as to defendant Hertz Vehicles, LLC only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Declaration Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SEPARATE STATEMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (EXHIBITS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Amendment to Complaint (RE: OKAFOR KENECHUKWU - DOE 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PERSONALLY SERVES HERTZ VEHICLES LLC BY SERVING MARIA SANCHEZ ON 3/13/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: hertz vehicles, llc ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: DARLINGTON CHILAKA NJOKU ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Application - Miscellaneous (GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: DARLYNG ARACELY VARGAS RE:DULCE CLARYTA VARGAS RECEIVED AND SUBMITTED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less