Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2021 at 00:52:38 (UTC).

OSVALDO VELEZ VS PAYLESS HOLDINGS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/16/2013 OSVALDO VELEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PAYLESS HOLDINGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4720

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VELEZ OSVALDO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

DUDEK JOHN

PAYLESS HOLDINGS

PAYLESS SHOESOURCE INC.

PAYLESS SHOESOURCE WORLDWIDE INC.

SOTOOHI BRUCE

Other

SAVARESE MELANIE R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RAGER JEFFERY A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LATHROP & GAGE LLP

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

10/21/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

11/1/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/26/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

12/4/2013: DEFENDANTS? ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/21/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

4/4/2014: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

4/4/2014: NOTICE OF AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

5/14/2014: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS AND/OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/14/2014: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS AND/OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Minute Order -

6/17/2014: Minute Order -

STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING THE PARTIES TO FILE LONGER MEMORANDA FOR THEIR RESPECTIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/8/2014: STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING THE PARTIES TO FILE LONGER MEMORANDA FOR THEIR RESPECTIVE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS? COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; ETC

7/10/2014: DEFENDANTS? COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE

7/10/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

7/10/2014: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

7/10/2014: DEFENDANTS? SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/12/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/23/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

9/23/2014: Minute Order -

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Docketat 08:31 am in Department 34, Michael P. Linfield, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • DocketNotice (ERRATA TO STATEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketOrder-Protective (STIPULATED ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (EVIDENCE IN SUPPT OF MO ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment (9/23/14 ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketPoints and Authorities; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketStatement of Facts; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketNotice (posting jury fees ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (2 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Conference Date; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (SERV. PAYLESS SHOESSOURCE INC.CORP ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAYLESS SHOE SOURCE INC A MISSOURI CORPORATION is a litigant