This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 13:53:41 (UTC).

OSTEROID ENTERPRISES LLC ET AL VS RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 OSTEROID ENTERPRISES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RED WHITE DISTRIBUTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUIS A. LAVIN, JAMES C. CHALFANT, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, BARBARA A. MEIERS and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0459

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUIS A. LAVIN

JAMES C. CHALFANT

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

BARBARA A. MEIERS

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Petitioners

OSTER ERIC

OSTEROID ENTERPRISES LLC

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION LLC

CHEBAN MIKHAIL

DOES 1-10

LENDING SOLUTION CORP

MESEONZNIK ALEX

PACIFIC COAST FOOD

PACIFIC COST CO

PACIFIC COST COMPANY LLC

PACIFIC FOOD

PACIFIC FOOD DISTRIBUTION

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTIN SACRAMENTO LLC

SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC

Defendants and Respondents

CHEBAN MIKHAIL

DOES 1-10

LENDING SOLUTION CORP

MESEONZNIK ALEX

PACIFIC COAST FOOD

PACIFIC COST CO

PACIFIC COST COMPANY LLC

PACIFIC FOOD

PACIFIC FOOD DISTRIBUTION

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTIN SACRAMENTO LLC

RED & WHITE DISTRIBUTION LLC

SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

COTTONE & MOON

GENTINO ROBERT E.

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GENTINO ROBERT E.

BAYER KENNETH H. ESQ.

BODELL GREGORY SCOTT

MENDLIN JOYCE S.

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT GENTINO

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BAYER KENNETH H. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT GENTINO

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

2/20/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/18/2019

11/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/18/2019

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

2/4/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS -

2/4/2013: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/5/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFEANTS? OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ERIC OSTER SUPPORTIN PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION

2/15/2013: DEFEANTS? OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ERIC OSTER SUPPORTIN PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION

PLAINTIFFS?EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, RE: APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

2/15/2013: PLAINTIFFS?EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, RE: APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

NOTICE OF RULING

2/19/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/21/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/4/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) I?FMPORARV RESTRAINING ORDERS AND ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONS; AND (2) APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER A

3/22/2013: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) I?FMPORARV RESTRAINING ORDERS AND ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONS; AND (2) APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER A

Minute Order -

3/22/2013: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF EDWIN R. COTTONE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARRE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

3/22/2013: DECLARATION OF EDWIN R. COTTONE, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARRE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

Minute Order -

5/30/2013: Minute Order -

OPPOSITION TO OSTEROID PARTIES? MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATIONS OF SHERRI MALTA AND ROBERT GENTINO

10/21/2013: OPPOSITION TO OSTEROID PARTIES? MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATIONS OF SHERRI MALTA AND ROBERT GENTINO

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/6/2014: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 4:01 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Red & White Distributin Sacramento, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketMOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL MISTAKE IN JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CODE CIV. PROC. 473(D); DECLARATION OF MARTIN HORWITZ IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO OSTEROID PARTIES SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ERIC OSTER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Osteroid Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); Eric Oster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Osteroid Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); Eric Oster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Osteroid Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); Eric Oster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Red & White Distribution, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMITRIDGE ENTERPRISE LLC is a litigant