This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:06:12 (UTC).

OSCAR VAZQUEZ VS ACES COLLISION CENTER INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2016 OSCAR VAZQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ACES COLLISION CENTER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2392

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VAZQUEZ OSCAR

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

KIM ELI K

ACES AUTO BODY INC

ACES COLLISION CENTER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DA VEGA|FISHER|MECHTENBERG LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/2/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY FOR ALL HOURS WORKED (CAL. LABOR CODE ? 200, 201, 202, AND 203); ETC

6/2/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY FOR ALL HOURS WORKED (CAL. LABOR CODE ? 200, 201, 202, AND 203); ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/14/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/12/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY FOR ALL HOURS WORKED (CAL. LABOR CODE 200, 201, 202, AND 203); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Oscar Vazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACES AUTOBODY INC is a litigant