This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 08:24:15 (UTC).

OSCAR OQUELI VS JAMAR IKEEM EDWARDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2016 OSCAR OQUELI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMAR IKEEM EDWARDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5091

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OQUELI OSCAR

Defendants and Respondents

VISTITSKY MAX

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

EDWARDS JAMAR IKEEM

DOES 1 TO 100

DAVIS CHANEE DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WALCH ROBERT S. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

FREED LEESA A. ESQ.

TRAYLOR MICHAEL STEVEN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/1/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

12/8/2016: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

Unknown

12/8/2016: Unknown

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/5/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

9/11/2017: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

Unknown

10/30/2017: Unknown

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

2/28/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES

2/28/2018: ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order

4/9/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/13/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

1/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/27/2019: Unknown

Other -

5/10/2019: Other -

General Denial

5/10/2019: General Denial

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/13/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/14/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Oscar Oqueli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • General Denial; Filed by Jamar Ikeem Edwards (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Statement of Jamar Garland; Filed by Jamar Ikeem Edwards (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Application for Order to Publish; Filed by Oscar Oqueli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Oscar Oqueli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 91; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Davis, Chanee (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Oscar Oqueli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Oscar Oqueli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Oscar Oqueli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC635091    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 29

Oqueli v. Edwards, et al.

The Four Motions filed by Plaintiff Oscar Oqueli to Compel Defendant Jamar Ikeem Edwards to Respond to Set One of Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Sanctions, filed on 01/22/20, are GRANTED.

Defendant is ordered to provide verified responses without objection to the foregoing discovery within 10 days. (Code Civ. Proc. §§ 2031.300, 2030.290.)

Plaintiff’s Motion for an Order to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted and Request for Sanctions, filed on 01/22/20, is GRANTED. (Code Civ Proc. § 2033.280(b).) The Requests for Admission are deemed admitted.

The Court imposes sanctions in the total sum of $1,240 for all four motions against Defendant Jamar Ikeem Edwards and Defendant’s counsel of record Michael Steven Traylor, jointly and severally, for the failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery, which constitutes discovery abuse, and whose conduct necessitated motion practice. (Code Civ. Proc. §2023.010(a)(4); § 2033.280(c).)

Moving party is ordered to give notice.