Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:05:42 (UTC).

OSCAR ABEL JOVEL RIVAS VS IRIS O FUNESESPINOZA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 OSCAR ABEL JOVEL RIVAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IRIS O FUNESESPINOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6731

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RIVAS OSCAR ABEL JOVEL

Defendants and Respondents

FUNESESPINOZA IRIS O.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

ESPINOZA IRIS O.

ESPINOZA IRIS FUNES

FUNESESPINOZA IRIS O. AKA IRIS O. FUNEZ ESPINOZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LARRY H. PARKER INC. THE

PLUNKETT SAMUEL PAUL ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

GONTER KARL ROBERT JR

KANDARIAN-STEIN GINA YVONNE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

10/11/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/27/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

12/9/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

12/9/2016: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/9/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

10/30/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

[ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

11/17/2017: [ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/20/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

DEFENDANT ESPINOZA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF; ECT.

7/18/2018: DEFENDANT ESPINOZA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF; ECT.

DECLARATION

7/25/2018: DECLARATION

ORDER

9/5/2018: ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF; MORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GINA Y. KANDARIANSTEIN; DECLARATION RE EX PARTE NOTICE; ORDER

9/5/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF; MORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GINA Y. KANDARIANSTEIN; DECLARATION RE EX PARTE NOTICE; ORDER

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF RULING OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order

9/27/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

11/8/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/7/2018: Unknown

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition (of Plaintiff; Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Plaintiff's Legal Representation) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Contempt for Failure of Plaintiff to Appear on 09/27/2018) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial, final status conference and discovery cut-off) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Motion to Compel Depositi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Motion to Compel (DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF); Filed by Iris Funes Espinoza Erroneously Sued As Iris O. Funesespinoza (Defendant); Iris O. Espinoza (Defendant); Iris Funes Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Declaration (OF GINA Y. KANDARIANSTEIN IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS); Filed by Iris Funes Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OP DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Oscar Abel Jovel Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Oscar Abel Jovel Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC636731    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 29

Rivas v. Funes Espinoza

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with California Rules of Court 3.1362. The order is effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the order on Plaintiff. Until then, counsel remains counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

NOTE: APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED AS A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS ALSO SET FOR THIS DATE.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONTER KARL ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANDARIAN-STEIN GINA Y.