Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 20:58:15 (UTC).

ONYEBUCHI N AWAJI VS JAYCEON T TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 04/06/2015 ONYEBUCHI N AWAJI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAYCEON T TAYLOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK, ELIA WEINBACH and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7677

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

ELIA WEINBACH

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AWAJI ONYEBUCHI N.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

TAYLOR JAYCEON T.

Not Classified By Court

PASTERNAK DAVID J.

BLAKE C. ALSBROOK SUCCESSOR RECEIVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAYFIELD & WALLACE APC

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

7/24/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER OF TRANSFER

7/24/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER OF TRANSFER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVE...)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVE...)

Undertaking

1/17/2020: Undertaking

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER AUTHORIZING AND APPROVING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP REAL PROPERTY

1/31/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER AUTHORIZING AND APPROVING SALE OF RECEIVERSHIP REAL PROPERTY

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO LIST PROPERTY

2/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO LIST PROPERTY

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/18/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion re: - Motion re: FORECLOSE CHARGING ORDER LIEN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AMEND JUDGMENT

2/19/2019: Motion re: - Motion re: FORECLOSE CHARGING ORDER LIEN OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AMEND JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FORECLOSE CHARGING ORDER LIEN OR, I...)

3/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FORECLOSE CHARGING ORDER LIEN OR, I...)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

5/21/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

ELECTION NOT TO FILE AFFIDAVID (CCP SUBSECTION 170.6)

7/24/2015: ELECTION NOT TO FILE AFFIDAVID (CCP SUBSECTION 170.6)

Minute Order -

7/24/2015: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER

4/29/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER

Minute Order -

5/16/2016: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

4/12/2017: Minute Order -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

4/14/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

NOTICE OF (A) PENDENCY OF CASE UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY CODE; (B) APPOINTMENT OF TRUSTEE; AND (C) LIEN FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

9/28/2017: NOTICE OF (A) PENDENCY OF CASE UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY CODE; (B) APPOINTMENT OF TRUSTEE; AND (C) LIEN FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • Hearing01/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other for Issuance of OSC re Turnover of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMotion re: (OSC and Turnover); Filed by Blake C. Alsbrook, Successor Receiver (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Blake C. Alsbrook, Successor Receiver (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Blake C. Alsbrook, Successor Receiver (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for Issuance of Order Authorizing and Approving Sale of Receivership Real Property) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketOrder (AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO LIST AND MARKET RECEIVERSHIP REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 25090 MULHOLLAND HIGHWAY, C ALABASAS, CALIFORNIA FOR SALE); Filed by Blake C. Alsbrook, Successor Receiver (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order Authorizing Receiver to List Property); Filed by Blake C. Alsbrook, Successor Receiver (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Issuance of Order Auth...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (for Issuance of Order Authorizing and Approving Sale of Receivership Real Property); Filed by Blake C. Alsbrook, Successor Receiver (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketUndertaking

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Onyebuchi N. Awaji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Onyebuchi N. Awaji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ASSAULT & BATTERY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC577677    Hearing Date: January 14, 2021    Dept: 51

The motion for Issuance of OSC re: turnover of real property is granted.