This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 04:06:27 (UTC).

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC VS REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 07/13/2016 ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against REFERRAL DESIGN CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARY H. STROBEL and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5499

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARY H. STROBEL

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

GREEN PROS

REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC.

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 60

MEMEGED TEVUOT SHEMESH

TITAN SOLAR CONSTRUCTION

HAIMOF OFIR

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

SHEMESH MEMEGED TEVUOT

PROS GREEN

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

BOTTONI JAMES ROE 28

AUBRY SHERRYL

GOLDEN PATIO RESTORATION

MIRANDA RICKY JR.

LAWRENCE KENNY ROE 26

HIRSCH PIPE & SUPPLE CO. INC ROE 27

HELIOPOWER INC

LUONG PAUL

CUEVAS MARY L

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCHOLEFIELD P.C. CONSTRUCTION LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

MOUZIS GERALD W.

THE MOUZIS LAW FIRM

WOO AMBER N.

Cross Defendant Attorney

BAZAN JOHN FAUSTINO

Other Attorneys

SCHOLEFIELD PAMELA JEAN

BUCHANAN NATASHA KAMDAR

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/22/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/10/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/23/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF INABILITY TO MEDIATE

4/25/2018: NOTICE OF INABILITY TO MEDIATE

Proof of Service

4/25/2018: Proof of Service

Unknown

5/2/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Proof of Service

5/8/2018: Proof of Service

STIPULATION FOR: ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AS AGAINST REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA GREEN PROS AND MEMEGED TEVUOT SHEMESH DBA TITAN SOLAR CONSTRUCTION, AND; ETC.

5/10/2018: STIPULATION FOR: ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AS AGAINST REFERRAL DESIGN & CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA GREEN PROS AND MEMEGED TEVUOT SHEMESH DBA TITAN SOLAR CONSTRUCTION, AND; ETC.

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/15/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/30/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/7/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/7/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Onesource Distributors, LLC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Onesource Distributors, LLC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Stipulation for Order of Distribution, Exoneration, and Discharge; and Proposed Order); Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC RE Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Referral Design & Construction Inc. (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Mary L Cuevas (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Summons (Cross-complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
263 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Onesource Distributors, LLC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Onesource Distributors, LLC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Onesource Distributors, LLC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Onesource Distributors, LLC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC FOR: 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TITAN SOLAR & CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where REFERRAL DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA GREEN PROS is a litigant

Latest cases where HELIOPOWER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant