This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:20:51 (UTC).

OMID NOURMOHAMADIAN VS BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 OMID NOURMOHAMADIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0240

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Respondents and Defendants

BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

DOES 1 TO 50

Minor

NOURMOHAMADIAN OMID

Guardian Ad Litem

SHARIFZADEH SHABNAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GIBEAUT GARY ROBERT ESQ.

MADRUGA THOMAS M.

Minor Attorney

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

Other Attorneys

BENJI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

PETITION OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR COMPROMISE OF DISP. CLAIM OF MINOR

8/9/2018: PETITION OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR COMPROMISE OF DISP. CLAIM OF MINOR

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RE NAME CHANCE (C.C.P 473)

9/24/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RE NAME CHANCE (C.C.P 473)

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING

10/3/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING

Order

10/23/2018: Order

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Notice

11/6/2018: Notice

Unknown

11/30/2018: Unknown

Stipulation and Order

12/11/2018: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

12/11/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/19/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/7/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

1/7/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/6/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

2/8/2019: Notice of Ruling

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Money into a Blocked Account) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Order to Show Cause Re: Pr...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Omid R. Nour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Omid R. Nour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Omid R. Nour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Omid); Filed by Omid R. Nour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Shabnam Sharifzadeh (Legacy Party); Omid R. Nour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJI DANIEL ESQ.