Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 14:18:04 (UTC).

OMEGA DESIGN INC. VS. BRENDA KLASS AND DOES 1-50

Case Summary

On 06/22/2016 OMEGA DESIGN INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRENDA KLASS AND DOES 1-50. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4327

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

OMEGA DESIGN INC.

OMEGA DESIGN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-50

KLASS BRENDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TENNER JAMES LEE

Defendant Attorney

WEINSTEIN SHELLEY ANNE

Cross Defendant Attorney

SMITH ROBERT FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/02/2019

8/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/02/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/7/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Ruling

9/1/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order for Publication

3/2/2017: Order for Publication

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-17 00:00:00

3/17/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-03-17 00:00:00

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-05-19 00:00:00

5/19/2017: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2017-05-19 00:00:00

Answer

6/15/2017: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/15/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order To Attorneys James Lee Tenner for Conference-Mandatory Settlement

11/16/2017: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order To Attorneys James Lee Tenner for Conference-Mandatory Settlement

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00

1/8/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-01-08 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel

4/19/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Motion to Compel

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00

8/31/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00

Minute Order -

9/21/2018: Minute Order -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/8/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Stipulation to Continue T...)

2/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application and Stipulation to Continue T...)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why the Complaint/First Amended Answer to Verified Cross-Complaint Should Not Be Stricken for Failure of Corporate Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant to Obtain Counsel) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: ( Why sanctions in the sum of $250 should not be assessed against counsel James Tenner for failure to comply with court's order of 9/01/20 pursuant to CCP 177.5) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Robert Frederick Smith (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why sanctions in the sum of $250 sho...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JAMES L. TENNER CONCERNING OSC RE: SANCTIONS); Filed by Omega Design Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; (OSC-Court's; Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-02-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; OSC-Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-02-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-11-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Omega Design Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Omega Design Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Omega Design Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC104327    Hearing Date: September 01, 2020    Dept: T

TENTATIVE RULING:

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF BY JAMES TENNER ESQ

GRANTED

COUNSEL IS RELIEVED ONLY WHEN THE PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE CONFORMED ORDER IS SERVED ON THE CLIENT

COUNSEL IS REMINDED THAT IF NO POS IS FILED, HE WILL CONTINUE TO REMAIN COUNSEL OF RECORD

Case Number: LC104327    Hearing Date: August 05, 2020    Dept: T

OMEGA, etc.

Plaintiff,

vs.

KLASS, et. al.

Defendants.

CASE NO: LC104327

TENTATIVE RULING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF OMEGA DESIGN INC.

Hearing 8/5/20 at 8:30 a.m.

TENTATIVE RULING: DENY WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Preliminarily, the court is unable to locate a Motion to be Relieved. Additionally, moving party has failed to submit a proof of service of the original moving papers on his client or any other counsel. Moving party has failed to submit a proof of service of notices of continuance on his client. Moving party may continue the hearing in order to comply with notice of motion requirements per statute. Proof of service of the continued date must show service on the client and all counsel. Also, the proposed order is blank and has no address or telephone number for client. IT IS SO ORDERED, CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OMEGA DESIGN INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED SMITH (LORENZO GASPARETTI)