This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 12:41:02 (UTC).

OMARI JOHNSON VS TAKUI AYVAZYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2016 OMARI JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TAKUI AYVAZYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5257

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JOHNSON OMARI

Defendants and Respondents

AYVAZYAN ARMEN

GOLDHEART PRODUCTIOSN INC.

AYVAZYAN TAKUI

MONALIZZA RESTAURANT & BANQUET

LONG BRIAN KIRK

DOES 1 TO 90

GOUGH LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HUTTON REBECCA

LAW HUTTON

Defendant Attorneys

GREEN BJORN C. ESQ.

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LAW O/O

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/19/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

8/18/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/22/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF STEVEN C. ARMBRUSTER TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFF OMARI JOHNSON; ETC

2/14/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF STEVEN C. ARMBRUSTER TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFF OMARI JOHNSON; ETC

Minute Order

3/17/2017: Minute Order

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

3/17/2017: ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/5/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RE-SETTING OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE

4/18/2017: NOTICE OF RE-SETTING OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/23/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Unknown

5/30/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

7/20/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/29/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/29/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PER3ONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

11/15/2017: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (PER3ONAL INJURY OR WRONGFUL DEATH)

Minute Order

11/29/2017: Minute Order

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF, OMARI JOHNSON'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF ANDREW WILLIAMS, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 37; (OSC-Failure to File Request Ent of Def; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Omari Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Omari Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Takui Ayvazyan (Defendant); Monalizza Restaurant & Banquet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 97; (Order ReRelated Cases; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Omari Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDHEART PRODUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MONALIZZA RESTAURANT & BANQUET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUTTON REBECCA S.