Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:33:28 (UTC).

OLIVIER H DEBRAY VS SUFIAN ALI KASSAM

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 OLIVIER H DEBRAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUFIAN ALI KASSAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5029

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DEBRAY OLIVIER L.

DEBRAY OLIVIER

Defendants and Respondents

KASSAM SUFIAN ALI

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

CRESTAR INVESTMENT CORPORATION

KASSAM ZESHAN

TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT INC.

RAWJEE ADNAN

KASSAM SEMINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MERRITT BRENT STEPHEN

LDT CONSULTING INC.

BILLER DIMITRIOS P.

BILLER DIMITRIOS PETER

Defendant Attorneys

MACDONALD SCOTT L.

DAVIS BRUCE C.

THOMAS BRYAN MATTHEW

MACDONALD SCOTT LEE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

2/13/2018: Legacy Document

Notice of Ruling

2/16/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

3/7/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document

3/12/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/28/2018: Legacy Document

Opposition

7/12/2018: Opposition

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/25/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Reply

8/10/2018: Reply

Notice of Ruling

8/13/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

9/25/2018: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF BRUCE C. DAVIS

8/22/2016: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF BRUCE C. DAVIS

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/29/2016: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/2/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

9/28/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

10/28/2016: AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

DEFENDANT SUFIAN ALI KASSAM'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND OVERRULE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SECO

11/2/2016: DEFENDANT SUFIAN ALI KASSAM'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND OVERRULE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND SECO

DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/12/2016: DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

12/20/2016: Minute Order

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by SUFIAN ALI KASSAM (Defendant); SEMINA KASSAM (Defendant); ZESHAN KASSAM (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (to Withdraw as Counsel) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (1) Trial Setting Conference; 2) Hearing on Motion for Order...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by SUFIAN ALI KASSAM (Defendant); SEMINA KASSAM (Defendant); ZESHAN KASSAM (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Notice of Motion (& Motion for an Order allowing LDT Consulting, Inc. and Dimitrios P. Biller to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Olivier Debray; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Motion; Declaration of Dimitrios P. Biller); Filed by OLIVIER DEBRAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
380 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Olivier L. Debray (Plaintiff); OLIVIER DEBRAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MERRITT BRENT STEPHEN