Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 13:55:39 (UTC).

OLGA PADILLA VS CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK

Case Summary

On 09/20/2011 OLGA PADILLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF HUNTINGTON PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET M. BERNAL, TORRIBIO, JOHN A., RAUL A. SAHAGUN, YVONNE T. SANCHEZ and MCKNEW, THOMAS I., JR.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9550

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET M. BERNAL

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

MCKNEW, THOMAS I., JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PADILLA OLGA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

IMPREMEDIA LLC

FIGUEROA GIL

IMPREMEDIA DISTRIBUTION CO. LLC

HUNTINGTON PARK CITY OF

MICHAEL CAMPILLO

LA OPINION INC.

CAMPILLO MICHAEL

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SWANSON RICK

HUNTINGTON PARK CITY OF

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LA OPINION IMPREMEDIA LLC

IMPREMEDIA LLC

FIGUEROA GIL

SWANSON RICK

IMPREMEDIA DISTRIBUTION CO. LLC

FIGUEROA GILBERT

LA OPINION LP

HUNTINGTON PARK CITY OF

MICHAEL CAMPILLO

CAMPILLO MICHAEL

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS VINCENT W. LAW OFFICES OF

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON & COLEGATE LLP

LYNBERG & WATKINS

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH A LAW CORP

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LYNBERG & WATKINS

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

CALENDO PUCKETT SHEEDY & DICORRADO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE DISMISSAL ON CROSS COMPLAINTC/F 05/27/14AND OSC RE DISMISSAL AS TO THECOMPLAINT) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal (IN MINUTE ORDER OF 7/31/14 ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; THIRD AMENDED COMPLAIN; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (NOTICE OF RULING AT MSC FSC/OSC RE SANCTIONS AGAINST PRO PER DEFENDANTS; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HUNTINGTON PARK, CITY OF (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
332 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERE- NCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by OLGA PADILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Impremedia, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LA OPINION L P A CALIFORNIA L P is a litigant

Latest cases where HUNTINGTON PARK CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS VINCENT WALTER