This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 13:36:58 (UTC).

OLGA HERRARTE VS WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/17/2013 OLGA HERRARTE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN S. CURREY, DAVID SOTELO and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5572

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN S. CURREY

DAVID SOTELO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HERNANDEZ RAYMOND

HERRARTE OLGA

RAYMOND HERMANDEZ SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

OLGA HERRARTE HEIR OF DECEDENTS

MICHAEL EDWARD HERNANDEZ

DAMIAN JOSE HERNANDEZ

Defendants and Respondents

AGWU ONWUKA (MICHAEL) OCHURU

ANAYA MERCEDES

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

HERNANDEZ JESSE

M & M ENTERPRISES

PRIMEWEST MANAGEMENT AND REAL ESTATE

WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC

ONWUKA "MICHAEL" OCHURU AGWU

PRIMEWEST MANAGEMENT

MERCEDES ANAYA

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HORNER & ASSOCIATES

JESSE HERNANDEZ

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

DUNKIN CRAIG L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

7/17/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/5/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/5/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL, LLC, ONWUKA ?MICHAEL? OCHURU AGWU AND MERCEDES ANAYA TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

9/4/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL, LLC, ONWUKA ?MICHAEL? OCHURU AGWU AND MERCEDES ANAYA TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF RAYMOND HERNANDEZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11, 377.31, 377.32

12/3/2013: DECLARATION OF RAYMOND HERNANDEZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11, 377.31, 377.32

STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AND ORDER THEREON

12/13/2013: STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST AND ORDER THEREON

PROOF OF SERVICE

7/14/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF BRENTON L. HORNER IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WITNESS NILMO ALFARO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA

7/14/2014: DECLARATION OF BRENTON L. HORNER IN SUPPORT OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WITNESS NILMO ALFARO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WITNESS NILMO ALFARO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA

9/24/2014: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WITNESS NILMO ALFARO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA

Minute Order

12/1/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC56 1702 WITH CASE NO. BC5 15572; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRENTON L. HORNER [PROPOSED ORDER] R?R1N C1LO R?NR? N..I..

12/5/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC56 1702 WITH CASE NO. BC5 15572; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF BRENTON L. HORNER [PROPOSED ORDER] R?R1N C1LO R?NR? N..I..

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WITNESS NILMO ALFARO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA

12/10/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY WITNESS NILMO ALFARO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA

Proof of Service

1/15/2015: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF NON RECIEPT OF ANY OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC561702 WITH CASE NO. BC515572;

2/2/2015: NOTICE OF NON RECIEPT OF ANY OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE NO. BC561702 WITH CASE NO. BC515572;

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/10/2015: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

3/4/2015: RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Minute Order

3/5/2015: Minute Order

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

4/2/2015: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2016
  • Notice (OF DEMURRER HEARING AND CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Order (RULING RE: Order Transferring Case to IC Court and Vacating All Future Dates Calendared in Personal Injury hub court ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Order (RULING RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate ) Filed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Notice (OF NON RECIEPT OF ANY OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASE BC561702 WITH CASE BC515572 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Proof of Service (RE OSC why Witness Nilmo Alfaro Should not be held in Contempt for Failing to Appear at his Depositio n ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • Order (OSC WHY WITNESS NILMO ALFARO SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT HIS DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO SUBPOENA ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Declaration (OF BRENTON L. HORNER IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE **DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED** ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2013
  • Receipt (JURY FEES 150.00 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Proof of Service (summons and complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.