This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 10:35:36 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION VS GOODWINE GLASS

Case Summary

On 01/04/2012 OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOODWINE GLASS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6357

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORA-

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AKM FIRE INC.

FOUNDATION PILE INC.

FRAZIER MASONRY CORPORATION

FTM CORP.

GOODWINE GLASS COMPANY INC.

GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORPORATION

HAREL CONSTRUCTION SPECIALTIES

INDEPENDENT ROOFING CONSULTANTS

IRC TECHNOLOGIES INC.

KONE INC.

LARSEN CONSTRUCTION AND SUPPLY

LEKO CONSTRUCTION INC.

PAUL M. WOLFF CO.

STEEMAN MICHAEL PATRICK

MOES 1-25

Defendants and Respondents

INDEPENDENT ROOFING CONSULTANTS

PAUL M. WOLFF CO.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FTM CORP.

GRIFFIN DEWATERING CORPORATION

Intervenor

AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ASH PAUL V. ESQ.

POLLARD JOLYNN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

1/4/2012: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

1/4/2012: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE R1ANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2012: NOTICE OF CASE R1ANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/3/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/3/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/3/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/3/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/3/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/3/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/3/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

2/14/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STAEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE; VOLUNTARY EFFICIENT LITIGATION STIPU

2/14/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STAEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE; VOLUNTARY EFFICIENT LITIGATION STIPU

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR INFORMATION

2/16/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR INFORMATION

INDFPFN[)ENT ROOFING CONSULTANTS? NOTICE OF IW1LJRRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/23/2012: INDFPFN[)ENT ROOFING CONSULTANTS? NOTICE OF IW1LJRRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service -

2/24/2012: Proof of Service -

KONE INC?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION?S COMPLAINT FOR: (1 BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

2/24/2012: KONE INC?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION?S COMPLAINT FOR: (1 BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STAEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE; VOLUNTARY EFFICIENT LITIGATION STIPU

3/2/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STAEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE; VOLUNTARY EFFICIENT LITIGATION STIPU

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STAEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; AUR INFORMATION PACKAGE; VOLUNTARY EFFICIENT LITIGATION STIPU

3/2/2012: ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STAEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; AUR INFORMATION PACKAGE; VOLUNTARY EFFICIENT LITIGATION STIPU

217 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2015

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2015

Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2015

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2015

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2015

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Intervenor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2015

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2015

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2014

DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Intervenor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2014

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2014

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
414 More Docket Entries
02/03/2012

DocketORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2012

DocketORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2012

DocketORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVERSHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2012

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Old Republic General Insurance Corpora- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2012

DocketORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2012

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2012

DocketNOTICE OF CASE R1ANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2012

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2012

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2012

DocketComplaint; Filed by Old Republic General Insurance Corpora- (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less