This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 20:03:02 (UTC).

OKSANA PEKARSKY ET AL VS STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2015 OKSANA PEKARSKY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and GERALD ROSENBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2175

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

GERALD ROSENBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PEKARSKY ALAN

PEKARSKY JULIAN

PEKARSKY OKSANA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Plaintiff, Guardian Ad Litem and Petitioner

PEKARSKY OKSANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD M. FOSTER

FOSTER RICHARD

SULTANYAN SYLVIA

FOSTER RICHARD MARTIN

Defendant Attorneys

VASYUK NATALYA DMITRIYEVNA

STANLEY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/18/2015: Complaint

Application

5/18/2015: Application

Application

9/9/2015: Application

Application

7/11/2016: Application

Legacy Document

8/4/2016: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/12/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

9/9/2016: Answer

Legacy Document

9/9/2016: Legacy Document

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

10/13/2016: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2016: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document

11/2/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

11/2/2016: Legacy Document

Minute Order

11/10/2016: Minute Order

Legacy Document

11/10/2016: Legacy Document

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

12/7/2016: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Legacy Document

12/13/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

2/10/2017: Legacy Document

Minute Order

3/20/2017: Minute Order

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal, Pursuant to Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by OKSANA PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); ALAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); JULIAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Notice (OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT); Filed by OKSANA PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); ALAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); JULIAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review RE: Notice of Settlement of Entire...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Statement of the Case; Filed by OKSANA PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); ALAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); JULIAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Witness List; Filed by OKSANA PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); ALAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); JULIAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
156 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2015
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by OKSANA PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); ALAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); JULIAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by OKSANA PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); ALAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff); JULIAN PEKARSKY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANDARD MANAGEMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASYUK NATALYA DMITRIYEVNA